+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/29
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
- Concurred
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 3 0
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor