+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 19
- Motion to reconsider laid on table
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass 13 0 1
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee