+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/22
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from House
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor