+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 0 2
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 61 nays 30
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee