+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/04
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 11
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee