+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5
- Concurred
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 11
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 8
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 1 0
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:45
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor