+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/05
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee
- Received from House
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Transportation
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor