+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16
- Concurred
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee