+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 70
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 2 3
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Human Services
- Request return from committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee