+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 90
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Request return from committee
- Rereferred to Education
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor