+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/01
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:55
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee