+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 10
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 34
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:45
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee