+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Schaible Elkin Marcellais
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Owens Zubke Guggisberg
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 01:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee