+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
- Concurred
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor