+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor