+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 56
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor