+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/01
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 1
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 28
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor