+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor