+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 25
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor