+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/25
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee