+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 18
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 13
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor