+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor