+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee