+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/20
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 0
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee