+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on table
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 1 4
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee