+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee