+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 25
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 12
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor