+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7, Emergency clause carried
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee