+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/31
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed, placed on calendar
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor