+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/14
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1
- Concurred
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 4 3
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor