+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 02/23
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 02/23
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 2
- Emergency clause carried
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor