+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/16
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 33
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:15
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor