+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/31
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee