+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/13
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
- Concurred
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
- Received from House
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor