+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 23
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor