+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 1
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:40
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee