+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 94
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor