+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/27
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/26
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5, Emergency clause carried
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee