+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Human Services
- Request return from committee
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor