+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 59
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee