+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Transportation
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Reported back, do pass 6 0 0
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
- Received from House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee