+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/12
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 16
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee