+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor