+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/18
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/17
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 21
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:45
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor