+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor