+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Elkin Rust Oban
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Schreiber-Beck Strinden Hager
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Education
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee