+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 4
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Taxation
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 9
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee