+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 2
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee