+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/24
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed J. Lee Larsen Warner
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Damschen Seibel Oversen
- Refused to concur
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 22 0 1
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor