+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider failed
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Requested House to return
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:15
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor